+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- JPS
- SUB Floor Amend to JPS - Farnsworth - passed
- Floor Amend to Farnsworth SUB Floor Amend - Hernandez - failed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Salman - failed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Engel - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee: withdrawn.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref HHS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
April 9, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 22
March 5, 2018: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 22, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 29, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor