+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:02PM.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref HHS) withdrawn
- Barto flr amend (ref HHS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 25
February 27, 2018: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 27, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 22, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
January 29, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor