+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 197
- Action: Signed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 3, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor