+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 29, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor