+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor