+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 1, 2023: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor