+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES (ref GOV) adopted
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (5)
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 20
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 6
March 3, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 1, 2016: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor