+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting Senate action on House amendments
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 23, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Olson
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Aboud flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: Aboud flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Commerce and Energy: Withdrawn
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Aboud flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Aboud flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Olson Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Aboud flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Olson Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Aboud flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-22 approp_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 24, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 7
March 13, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
March 13, 2012: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 12, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
February 20, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor