+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:10 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- House first read
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 9:55 am
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Withdrawn
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-4 approp-ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2011: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor