+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: Amended by APPROP - Kavanagh - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Meyer
- Amendment withdrawn: Amended by RHS - Montenegro
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reform and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Reform and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Meyer Floor Amendment; Reference to APPROPRIATIONS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Reform and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Meyer Floor Amendment; Reference to APPROPRIATIONS Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
4-22 hhs-approp_aspassedhouse
Senate Fact Sheet
2-11 hhs-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
February 25, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2014: Reform and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 4, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9