+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Shope - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- CWD (ref Bill) adopted
- Worsley flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Worsley flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Shope - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
March 24, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
March 23, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
March 23, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
February 29, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 29, 2016: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 29, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 29, 2016: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
February 1, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 1, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor