+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- RULES - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: amended constitutional and in proper form.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- COMPS (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref COMPS) adopted
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 28, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
March 1, 2018: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 26, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 29, 2018: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor