+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
February 3, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor