+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:03PM.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 27, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
March 1, 2018: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 29, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor