+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: FAILED
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- COM (ref Bill) adopted
- Mesnard #1 flr amend (ref COM) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 43
March 9, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 9, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 26, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor