+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:15PM.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:36PM.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
March 1, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
January 26, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor