+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- House Health Committee: failed to pass.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- Barto flr amend (ref ED) adopted
- Allen flr amend (ref ED) failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2018: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 5
February 21, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
January 29, 2018: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 29, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor