+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
- Health: Do pass amended
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: O'Halleran flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HEALTH)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Health
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
O'Halleran Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill; substitute to HEALTH amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Adopted Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
O'Halleran Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill; substitute to HEALTH amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2008: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
April 1, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2008: Health: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor