+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
- Senator gould to show the bill failed to pass. motion failed by a division of 2 ayes and 21 noes.
- COW motion
- Amendment adopted: Burns flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Commerce and Economic Development: Withdrawn
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Burns Floor Amendment; reference to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Burns Floor Amendment; reference to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
February 21, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor