+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Barto flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 9, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
January 26, 2021: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor