+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment withdrawn: Floor amend to Bill - Olson
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Vote detail 16 14 0 0 y passed
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
- Senator smith motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb 1373 on third reading on march 8, 2012. motion carried.
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Crandall flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Crandall flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 13
March 19, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 13, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 8, 2012: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
February 14, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor