+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 180
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 10, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 26, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 3, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor