+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee: do pass.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:25PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Water and Energy Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Water and Energy Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (8)
March 9, 2016: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 9, 2016: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2016: Senate Water and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 28, 2016: Water and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8