+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Rules
- Approp
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Aboud flr amend (ref ED)
- Third read: Passed
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass amended
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Aboud Floor Amendment; reference to ED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Aboud Floor Amendment; reference to ED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
June 4, 2009: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor