+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
May 8, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
February 27, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 27, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor