+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 351
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to JUD - Farnsworth
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Antenori flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 9:55 amobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; reference to the Judiciary Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; reference to the Judiciary Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
March 14, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor