+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- JPS - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to JPS to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Smith flr amend (ref HHS) adopted
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
March 29, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
March 29, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
February 28, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
January 31, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor