+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Insurance Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Insurance Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Griffin #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Griffin #1 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (4)
Griffin #1 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Griffin #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
May 7, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
March 1, 2016: House Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 28, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 28, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1