+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Health: Failed to pass
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Rules
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HHS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS)
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2014: Health: Failed to pass (House)
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 7
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor