+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- CWD (ref Bill) adopted
- Griffin flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref CWD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Workforce Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
May 7, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
March 1, 2016: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 22, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 28, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9