+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference committee report.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- House caucus on conference committee report.
- House adopted conference committee report.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate caucus on conference committee report.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate members appointed to conference committee: BROPHY MCGEE, BARTO, QUEZADA
- Conference committee recommendation: That the Senate accept the House amendments and the bill be further amended.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- House members appointed to conference committee: COBB, ALLEN J, RIOS
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to HEALTH to Bill - Carter - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 5:09PM.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 9, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 6
April 27, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 27
April 17, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
February 22, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 20, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 31, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor