+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2016: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 18, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2016: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2016: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2016: Senate Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor