+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 284
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Quezada
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:51 pmobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-11 hmlr_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
02-13 hmlr_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-14 hmlr_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-6 hmlr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
April 10, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2012: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor