+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-10 bsfss-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2012: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
January 26, 2012: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2