+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hobbs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 31, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor