+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:15PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
March 3, 2021: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
March 3, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 23, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 26, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor