+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on final passage
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: APPROP - passed as amended
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Failed
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment: GOV - W/D
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to APPROP - Pearce
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to the APPROPRIATIONS Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
June 20, 2007: Senate final read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7
June 20, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
April 2, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2007: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 29, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor