+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: FAILED
- Senator Ugenti-Rita motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1353 on Final Reading on April 14, 2021. Motion carried.
- Final reading #2 in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to COM - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee: withdrawn.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Corrected Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:39PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
April 14, 2021: 2nd Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
April 14, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 15
April 8, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
March 8, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 8, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 26, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor