+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 249
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate reports to conference committee
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House appointed: Lesko, Olson, Wheeler
- Recommendation: that the Senate accept the House amendments and the bill be further amended.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
- Senate appointed: Worsley, Yarbrough, Farley
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
- House second read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Worsley flr amend (ref FIN)
- Amendment adopted: McComish flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (14)
Worsley flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Worsley flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
4-16 fin_aspassedhouse
Senate Fact Sheet
2-13 fin_aspassedcommittee
Senate Fact Sheet
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 7
April 22, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
March 13, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 13, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2014: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3