+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 80
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
- House second read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Worsley flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Worsley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Worsley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-13 FIN_ASPASSEDCOW
Senate Fact Sheet
2-10 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
February 4, 2014: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor