+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Final disposition: Held awaiting Senate action on House amendments
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Environment: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:23 amobject
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
2-14 wlrd
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 29, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
March 19, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
January 26, 2012: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor