+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 198
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
4-25 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
2-6 health-finance
Senate Fact Sheet
5-14 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 2, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 6
March 6, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2007: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2007: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
January 29, 2007: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7