+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 336
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On May 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref CED)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-25 ced_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
March 15, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 3, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1