+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 249 e
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 26, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRIPD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Hale flr amend (ref NRIPD)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Hale Floor Amendment; reference to NRIPD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Hale Floor Amendment; reference to NRIPD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 26, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
March 18, 2010: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 18, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor