+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 325
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 2:51 pm
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:23 am
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-13 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
May 3, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
March 1, 2012: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
January 26, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor