+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref FIN)
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref FIN)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2014: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 10, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
February 4, 2014: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor