+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- Trans
- Rules
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref TRANS)
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Withdrawn
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-7trans caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2007: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor