+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 219
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate reports to conference committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House appointed: Forese, Fann, Mccune Davis
- Recommendation: that the Senate accept the House amendments and the bill be further amended.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
- Senate appointed: Melvin, Mcguire, Shooter
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Shooter flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:22 pmobject
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-11 jud_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-15 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 2, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 8, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 6, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2013: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9