+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Kavanagh flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
March 2, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 2, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 31, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor