+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Commerce: Held
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Gov
- Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CE (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref CE)
- Amendment adopted: Melvin flr amend (ref CE)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Melvin flr amend (ref CE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
January 26, 2012: Commerce and Energy: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor